« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2019-094866
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
8/23/2019
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Tammy Bewley
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Johnny Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/22/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/22/2020
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
5/26/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
4/24/2020
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2020
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO GRANT DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING / ALTERNATIVELY MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/26/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/25/2020
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
2/27/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/7/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/7/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
1/10/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/9/2020
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
1/9/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2019
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
12/6/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/7/2019
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
11/14/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/6/2019
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
11/7/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/4/2019
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
11/5/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/24/2019
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/23/2019
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
8/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/6/2020
Time
13:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
3/30/2020
Time
15:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
4/27/2020
Time
15:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
5/22/2020
Time
9:30
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular