« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2019-052569
Judge:
O'Donnell-Smith, Colleen
File Date:
2/7/2019
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jennifer Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Patrick Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2020
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
2/25/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
1/10/2020
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
1/14/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/12/2019
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
12/13/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/23/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/28/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
CVD - Conversion to Dissolution
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/24/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/9/2019
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
9/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
6/17/2019
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
6/20/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/12/2019
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
6/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2019
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
5/28/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
2/15/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/11/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/9/2019
Time
8:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular