« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2019-000896
Judge:
Williams, Paula
File Date:
2/25/2019
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Alicia D Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Juan B Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
5/14/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
3/4/2019
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
3/5/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/25/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/26/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file