« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2018-000296
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
4/10/2018
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Evelyn Christine Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bradley Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOMESTIC RELATIONS/RE CITY OF PHOENIX DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER RE CITY OF PHOENIX DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN
Filing Date
11/21/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
11/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Petitioner
Filing Date
10/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2018
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
10/25/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
9/7/2018
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
9/10/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application and Affdiavit for Default
Filing Date
8/19/2018
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2018
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
8/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Petition for Dissolution of Marriage Without Children
Filing Date
7/9/2018
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/10/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/22/2018
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/26/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/11/2018
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
6/11/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2018
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/12/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/16/2018
Time
14:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
10/22/2018
Time
9:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular