« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2017-006164
Judge:
Astrowsky, Brad
File Date:
11/2/2017
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Janet Elaine Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Stephen Liebman
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT TO MODIUFY CONSENT DECREE OF A NON COVENANT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
3/19/2020
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/20/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT AND ORDER TO MODIFY CONSENT DECREE OF A NON-COVENANT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
Filing Date
3/13/2020
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment
Docket Date
2/14/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
2/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2020
Description
ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support
Docket Date
2/18/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE (ALIMONY) / SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE ARREARS
Filing Date
3/5/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/5/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2019
Description
RFN - Request To Restore Former Name
Docket Date
2/28/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/9/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/6/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/7/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/2/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/1/2018
Description
SOA – Stip Stop/Modify OOA IWO
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order
Docket Date
1/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2018
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/26/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MODIFY INCOME WITHHOLDING ORDER
Filing Date
1/17/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/16/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
1/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/6/2017
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
11/6/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
11/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/26/2020
Time
13:00
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
3/26/2020
Time
14:15
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing