« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2017-004145
Judge:
Brooks, Robert
File Date:
8/31/2017
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lindsey Anne McCaleb
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
James Warner Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/21/2017
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
11/14/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/13/2017
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/1/2017
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/31/2017
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file