« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2016-070422
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
8/25/2016
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Evelyn Christine Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bradley Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/27/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2017
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/12/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2017
Description
Orn - Order Reinstate Inactive Calen
Docket Date
11/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2017
Description
Mri - Motion To Reinstate On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
10/27/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
3/15/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
A/HEARING
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
1/6/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/29/2016
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
12/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
ALIAS
Filing Date
8/29/2016
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/1/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/25/2016
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/6/2017
Time
9:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
3/14/2017
Time
13:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular