« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2013-093001
Judge:
Miller, Keith
File Date:
5/20/2013
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ian James Hipps
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Lorretta Louise Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/17/2013
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
10/24/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/7/2013
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
8/2/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
7/23/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
07/13/13
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/20/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/9/2013
Time
8:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Specialty
Date
10/17/2013
Time
8:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Specialty