« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2013-090328
Judge:
Gnepper, Gregory
File Date:
2/19/2013
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Michael Berg
Party Name
Carey Robert Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2013
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
4/22/2013
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
4/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/14/2013
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
4/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/25/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/21/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/21/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file