« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2013-051624
Judge:
O'Donnell-Smith, Colleen
File Date:
4/26/2013
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
James Warren Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
C BROWN
Party Name
Suzanne Jane Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2014
Description
QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order
Docket Date
7/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2013
Description
241 - ME: Decree Signed By Court
Docket Date
7/17/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
7/9/2013
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
7/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2013
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
6/6/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
5/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
5/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/10/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/3/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2013
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/30/2013
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/24/2013
Time
9:15
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
7/16/2013
Time
15:45
Event
Resolution Management Conference