« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2012-051338
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
6/27/2012
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kent Ira Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Carrie Wilcox
Party Name
Sherri Lee Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DIRECTING MILITARY RETIRED PAY
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA STATE RETIREMENT DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA STATE RETIREMENT SYSTEM DOMESTIC RELATIONS
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order
Docket Date
12/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TOWN OF BUCKEYE 457 PLAN
Filing Date
12/3/2013
Description
QDO - Qualified Dom Rel Order
Docket Date
12/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CITY OF PEORIA 401(A) PLAN
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
8/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
2/21/2013
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
2/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
2/12/2013
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/15/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE TRIAL
Filing Date
2/5/2013
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
2/6/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL
Filing Date
10/16/2012
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
10/16/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLUTION
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLUTION
Filing Date
9/26/2012
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
10/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2012
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
8/2/2012
Description
NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation
Docket Date
8/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
8/2/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2012
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/29/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/10/2012
Time
16:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
2/19/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing