« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2011-050961
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
4/7/2011
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kimberly Lin Anderson
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael William Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2012
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/21/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
10/30/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE
Filing Date
10/22/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/25/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO EXTEND DISMISSAL DATE
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
10/3/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/27/2012
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/30/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
8/20/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/26/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/3/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
SERVED 06/19/2012
Filing Date
6/26/2012
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2012
Description
044 - ME: Case Reinstated
Docket Date
6/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO REINSTATE DISMISSED CASE
Filing Date
8/11/2011
Description
OLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service
Docket Date
8/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/7/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/7/2011
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/7/2011
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/7/2011
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/12/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file