« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2009-003638
Judge:
Halvorson, Ashley
File Date:
10/1/2009
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Leslie A Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jesse A McGrew
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2009
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/10/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/10/2009
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
12/14/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/23/2009
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
11/23/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/8/2009
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/9/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/1/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/5/2009
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/10/2009
Time
15:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular