« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2008-051101
Judge:
O'Donnell-Smith, Colleen
File Date:
6/2/2008
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kevin S Schuhmacher
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mechelle Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2008
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
8/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
7/1/2008
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
7/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/10/2008
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/12/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/2/2008
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/3/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/18/2008
Time
14:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular