« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2008-050647
Judge:
Knapp, James
File Date:
3/21/2008
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Deana A Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Daniel J Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2008
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/8/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/27/2008
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
7/1/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
5/13/2008
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/13/2008
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
5/14/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/21/2008
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
3/24/2008
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/27/2008
Time
8:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular