« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2008-003144
Judge:
Guyton, Lauren
File Date:
7/28/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Carey Robert Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Michael Berg
Party Name
Evie Kay Bethea Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT DEFAULT HEARING
Filing Date
12/17/2008
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
12/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
11/26/2008
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
11/26/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OFJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT WITHOUT HEARING
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MICHAEL W BERG IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST EVIE KAY BETHEA MEREDITY
Filing Date
10/14/2008
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
10/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
9/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
09/14/08
Filing Date
8/6/2008
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
8/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
7/28/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2008
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2008
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/17/2008
Time
14:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Specialty