« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2006-051947
Judge:
O'Donnell-Smith, Colleen
File Date:
10/17/2006
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William Dean Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Kathy Diane Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2007
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
1/8/2007
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
10/20/2006
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/25/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/20/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/25/2006
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
10/17/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/18/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/17/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/18/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/17/2006
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/18/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/17/2006
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/18/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/17/2006
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/20/2006
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file