« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2005-002527
Judge:
Russell, Andrew
File Date:
5/12/2005
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Monica Lisa Gonzalez
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Andrew Kane Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2005
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
8/8/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
6/10/2005
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
6/14/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/17/2005
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/19/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/13/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/13/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2005
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/13/2005
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/29/2005
Time
9:30
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular