« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2003-002251
Judge:
Zabor, Melissa
File Date:
5/12/2003
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lance E Martin
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Loretta Meredith-Martin
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2003
Description
TSP - Transcript of Proceedings
Docket Date
4/24/2004
Filing Party
NOTE:
10-29-03 A/V TRONICS
Filing Date
10/29/2003
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
11/7/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
7/21/2003
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
7/22/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/21/2003
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
7/22/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/21/2003
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/30/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF DUE DILIGENCE
Filing Date
6/16/2003
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
6/19/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
06/22/2003
Filing Date
5/12/2003
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/13/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2003
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/13/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2003
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/13/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2003
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/13/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/13/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
REGARDING CREDITORS
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/29/2003
Time
13:30
Event
Default Hearing Court Reporter Requested