« Return to search results Family Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: FN2003-001694 Judge: Blair, Michael
File Date: 4/4/2003 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Family Court Without Children  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Beth Noel  Black   Petitioner  Female  Pro Per 
Ralph Hubet  Barger   Respondent  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/27/2007  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet  10/2/2007   
7/25/2007  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/2/2007   
7/19/2007  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter  7/30/2007   
7/26/2005  NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney  8/16/2005   
7/25/2005  RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail  8/9/2005   
6/22/2005  DDI - Decree Of Dissolution  6/27/2005   
NOTE: Decree of Dissolution 
6/14/2005  MOT - Motion  6/23/2005   
NOTE: TO ACCELERATE 
5/25/2005  019 - ME: Ruling  5/25/2005   
5/23/2005  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  10/3/2006   
5/6/2005  012 - ME: Trial  5/6/2005   
3/30/2005  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  4/11/2005   
1/17/2005  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  1/17/2005   
12/14/2004  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  12/14/2004   
10/7/2004  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/7/2004   
9/23/2004  ORD - Order  9/29/2004   
NOTE: FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 
9/10/2004  029 - ME: Status Conference  9/10/2004   
9/10/2004  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  9/10/2004   
9/2/2004  MEM - Memorandum  9/13/2004   
NOTE: AMENDED TRIAL/RE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY 
9/1/2004  MOT - Motion  9/9/2004   
NOTE: TO STRIKE PETITIONERS SUPPLEMENT TO DISCLOSURE STATEMENT 
9/1/2004  RES - Response  9/9/2004   
NOTE: TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW 
8/31/2004  MOT - Motion  9/13/2004   
NOTE: TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD AND FOR ACCELERATED RULING 
8/31/2004  CER - Certificate  9/13/2004   
NOTE: OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD 
8/30/2004  NOT - Notice  9/13/2004   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENT TO WIFES PRETRIAL STATEMENT 
6/22/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/1/2004   
NOTE: 06/16/04 
6/10/2004  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  6/10/2004   
5/28/2004  012 - ME: Trial  5/28/2004   
5/25/2004  EXH - Exhibit  6/4/2004   
NOTE: / RECORD RELEASE FORM 
5/20/2004  OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone  6/7/2004   
NOTE: / WITNESS 
5/19/2004  STA - Statement  6/1/2004   
NOTE: WIFES PRETRIAL / 
5/19/2004  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  6/4/2004   
5/18/2004  MOT - Motion  6/1/2004   
NOTE: / IN LIMINE 
5/17/2004  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  6/1/2004   
5/7/2004  MOT - Motion  5/14/2004   
NOTE: / FOR WITNESS TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY 
5/7/2004  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  5/14/2004   
NOTE: AMENDED 
5/7/2004  MEM - Memorandum  5/14/2004   
NOTE: TRIAL/RE: INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY 
5/4/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/10/2004   
NOTE: SERVED 4/30/04 
4/29/2004  064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset  4/29/2004   
4/22/2004  029 - ME: Status Conference  4/22/2004   
4/16/2004  NOT - Notice  5/11/2004   
NOTE: / OF CONFLICT 
3/26/2004  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  3/26/2004   
3/19/2004  MOT - Motion  4/16/2004   
NOTE: / FOR EMERGENCY TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE AND FOR ACCELERATED RULING 
2/26/2004  ORD - Order  4/13/2004   
NOTE: / CONTINUING THE TRIAL 
2/26/2004  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  2/26/2004   
2/4/2004  MCO - Motion To Continue  5/11/2004   
NOTE: / TRIAL PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR FEBRUARY 23 2004 AT 9:00 AM AND FEBRUARY 24 2004 AT 9:00 AM 
1/27/2004  ORD - Order  5/11/2004   
NOTE: / FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR PETITIONER 
1/14/2004  MOT - Motion  5/11/2004   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 
12/16/2003  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  12/16/2003   
11/25/2003  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  11/25/2003   
11/25/2003  056 - ME: Hearing Set  11/25/2003   
11/4/2003  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/6/2003   
10/29/2003  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  2/9/2004   
NOTE: AMENDED 
10/29/2003  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  2/9/2004   
10/17/2003  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  10/17/2003   
10/9/2003  ORD - Order  12/13/2003   
NOTE: CONTINUING EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING TEMPORARY ORDERS FROM 09/09/03 TO 11/04/03 BEFORE THIS DIVISION 
9/26/2003  RES - Response  12/2/2003   
NOTE: TO PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE TEMPORARY ORDERS 
9/26/2003  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  12/2/2003   
9/18/2003  NOT - Notice  12/1/2003   
NOTE: OF NO OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 
9/10/2003  MOT - Motion  11/8/2003   
NOTE: FOR AN ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE 
9/9/2003  MCO - Motion To Continue  11/17/2003   
NOTE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING REGARDING TEMPORARY ORDERS 
8/5/2003  ORD - Order  10/21/2003   
NOTE: ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD 
7/25/2003  MOT - Motion  9/23/2003   
NOTE: FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD 
7/22/2003  NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure  8/25/2003   
7/18/2003  NOT - Notice  9/23/2003   
NOTE: OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM 
7/1/2003  ORA - Order To Appear  9/12/2003   
NOTE: FOR PETITION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS 
6/24/2003  PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause  9/12/2003   
NOTE: RE TEMPORARY ORDERS 
6/24/2003  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  9/12/2003   
5/21/2003  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  6/5/2003   
5/1/2003  ANS - Answer  5/5/2003   
5/1/2003  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  5/9/2003   
4/15/2003  OPR - Order Of Protection  4/23/2003   
4/15/2003  POP - Petition/Order Of Protection  4/23/2003  Petitioner 
4/15/2003  PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection  4/23/2003   
4/4/2003  COM - Complaint  4/8/2003   
4/4/2003  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  4/8/2003   
4/4/2003  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  4/8/2003   
4/4/2003  NOT - Notice  4/8/2003   
NOTE: REGARDING CREDITORS 
4/4/2003  NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins  4/8/2003   
4/4/2003  SUM - Summons  4/8/2003   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/9/200310:45  Temporary Order Evidentiary Hearing 
11/4/20038:45  Temporary Order Evidentiary Hearing 
12/4/200316:00  Temporary Order Evidentiary Hearing 
2/3/20049:00  Family Settlement Conference 
2/23/20049:00  Trial 
2/24/20049:00  Trial Continuing 
3/26/20049:30  Family Settlement Conference 
3/26/200411:30  Status Conference 
3/26/200415:00  Telephonic 
4/22/200414:30  Telephonic 
4/28/20048:30  Trial 
5/19/20049:00  Trial 
6/3/200414:00  Oral Argument 
7/2/20048:30  Trial Continuing 
9/1/200413:30  Status Conference 
9/2/20049:00  Trial Continuing 
10/1/20048:30  Status Conference 
11/8/20049:00  Trial 
12/13/200410:00  Trial 
2/16/20058:30  Trial 
3/23/200513:30  Trial 


click here for Law Library Resource Center