« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2002-006530
Judge:
Drake, Jim
File Date:
12/6/2002
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Quentin Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Seyffer
Party Name
Kimberly West
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2003
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
6/10/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
5/27/2003
Description
SCD - Stip For Entry Consent Decree
Docket Date
9/17/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2003
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/6/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
CREDIT MEMO
Filing Date
12/20/2002
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
12/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/10/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/10/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/10/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2002
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/10/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file