« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2002-005170
Judge:
Drake, Jim
File Date:
9/20/2002
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael W Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jennifer Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2003
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
9/8/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/4/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/19/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF SIGNATURE
Filing Date
8/25/2003
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
9/5/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/1/2003
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
10/3/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/30/2003
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
9/27/2003
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/25/2003
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2003
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/15/2003
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/28/2003
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PLACEMENT OF CASE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR AND OF INTENT TO DISMISS YOUR COURT CASE
Filing Date
4/10/2003
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/25/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2002
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
11/4/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/20/2002
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/20/2002
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/20/2002
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/20/2002
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/20/2002
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file