« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2001-090023
Judge:
Valenzuela, Michael
File Date:
2/7/2001
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Gillian Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Garrie Wayne McLaws
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2001
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
5/24/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
W/O COURT HEARING
Filing Date
5/17/2001 12:15:00 PM
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
5/17/2001 12:15:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
4/23/2001
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
4/23/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
2-13-01
Filing Date
4/23/2001
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
4/25/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/8/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/8/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/8/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/8/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file