« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2001-070416
Judge:
Francis, Jillian
File Date:
8/8/2001
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Pauline M Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William L Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2002
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/15/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2002
Description
910 - Case Transfer To Nw.
Docket Date
7/3/2002
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/3/2001
Time
13:30
Event
Default Hearing