« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2001-005857
Judge:
Knapp, James
File Date:
12/5/2001
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arthur C Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Angela M Hallum
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2002
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
6/11/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
3/27/2002
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
3/29/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2002
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
1/14/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
12/8/01
Filing Date
1/11/2002
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
1/14/2002
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/18/2001
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
1/16/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/5/2001
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/7/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/31/2002
Time
8:30
Event
Default Hearing