« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FN2001-003705
Judge:
Francis, Jillian
File Date:
8/8/2001
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court Without Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
William L Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Pauline M Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2002
Description
910 - Case Transfer To Nw.
Docket Date
7/3/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2002
Description
NWA - Notice Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
3/6/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2001
Description
DAN - Decree Of Annulment
Docket Date
1/9/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decree of Annulment
Filing Date
10/29/2001
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
10/31/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service
Docket Date
10/16/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
10/17/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
9-22-01
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
10/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2001
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/20/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/10/2001
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
10/12/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2001
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2001
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/3/2001
Time
13:30
Event
Default Hearing