« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2024-091881
Judge:
Miller, Keith
File Date:
5/9/2024
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cyndi Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Daniel Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFAULT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF A NON-COVENANT MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILDREN
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHILD SUPPORT ORDER
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
EDJ - Education Order - Joint
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING EDUCATION ORDER
Filing Date
10/14/2024
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
10/14/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARENTING PLAN FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING
Filing Date
8/19/2024
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/20/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/2/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
8/1/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/5/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
6/10/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
4 Hour - Co-Parenting _ Divorce Class
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/10/2024
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/12/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/24/2024
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/29/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING
Filing Date
5/9/2024
Description
NTC - Notice to Creditors
Docket Date
5/13/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/14/2024
Time
9:00
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular