« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2021-005194
Judge:
Davison, Harla
File Date:
8/23/2021
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Melissa Rivera
Party Name
Taylor Jaelynn Wilstein
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Nathaniel Robert Meredith-Sloan
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2024
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/13/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/11/2024
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
1/11/2024
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2023
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
12/5/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR A RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/26/2023
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/31/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
ECV - Establish/Custody/Visitation
Docket Date
4/9/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
4/9/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
4/9/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SOLE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING/PARTY A
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/9/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/9/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/6/2023
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/10/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/15/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2021
Description
256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing
Docket Date
9/30/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2021
Description
DPH - Default Judg/Ord Pat/Support
Docket Date
10/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certified copy of Default Judgment and Order as to Paternity and Order setting Support hearing reflecting date of filing/hearing date and time mailed / provided to parties by AGs Office
Filing Date
9/26/2021
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
9/29/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
PIP
Filing Date
9/3/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/10/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2021
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order To Appear Title IV-D
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
8/26/2021
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/27/2021
Time
8:15
Event
IV-D Establishment of Support