« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2020-096570
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
9/3/2020
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Gordon Ray Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Margarida Morais Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2021
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
3/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/11/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
1/12/2021
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
1/12/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/2020
Description
MAD - Motion And Affidavit For Default Dissolution
Docket Date
11/13/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/9/2020
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
10/13/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/10/2020
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
9/14/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/3/2020
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
9/3/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file