Family Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: FC2019-095384 Judge: Russell, Andrew
File Date: 7/8/2019 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Family Court With Children  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Brandon   Boudreaux   Petitioner  Male  Bradley Crider 
Melani   Boudreaux   Respondent  Female  J Scoresby 
Party is a minor: name not published   Minor  Male  Pro Per 
Party is a minor: name not published   Minor  Female  Pro Per 
Party is a minor: name not published   Minor  Male  Pro Per 
Party is a minor: name not published   Minor  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/31/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/31/2021   
8/18/2021  CRC – Court Report Confidential  8/19/2021   
NOTE: THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONIST STATUS UPDATE AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE COURT 
7/16/2021  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  7/16/2021   
7/8/2021  ORD - Order  7/14/2021   
NOTE: STIPULATED / RE COUNSELING FOR THE MINOR CHILDREN 
6/29/2021  NOT - Notice  6/30/2021   
NOTE: Notice/Motion for Withdrawal of Clarification of Grandparent Issue 
6/15/2021  029 - ME: Status Conference  6/15/2021   
5/14/2021  RNM - Returned Mail  5/14/2021   
NOTE:  
4/20/2021  ORD - Order  4/21/2021   
NOTE: RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULE FOR 5/24/21 
4/14/2021  MCO - Motion To Continue  4/19/2021   
NOTE: UNOPPOSED Motion to Continue STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR MAY 24 2021 
4/6/2021  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  4/6/2021   
4/2/2021  APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment  4/6/2021   
NOTE: Affidavit of Direct Payment  
3/30/2021  RES - Response  4/1/2021   
NOTE: Response and Objection to Report and Recommendations of Therapeutic Interventionist  
2/9/2021  AFF - Affidavit  2/11/2021   
NOTE: Affidavit of Direct Payment  
2/9/2021  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  2/11/2021   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment set forth in courts JANUARY 4 2021 RULING 
2/8/2021  SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access  2/9/2021   
1/19/2021  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  1/19/2021   
NOTE:  
1/6/2021  903 - ME: Judgment/Decree  1/6/2021   
1/5/2021  ORD - Order  1/6/2021   
NOTE: RE LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME 
1/4/2021  PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support  1/4/2021   
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET 
1/4/2021  PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support  1/4/2021   
NOTE: CHILD SUPPORT WORKSHEET 
12/9/2020  NOL - Notice of Lodging  12/9/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Order Re Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time 
11/23/2020  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  12/4/2020   
11/23/2020  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/23/2020   
11/20/2020  NOT - Notice  11/23/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF BLIND LIST 
11/20/2020  ORD - Order  11/20/2020   
NOTE: Therapeutic Intervention 
11/18/2020  029 - ME: Status Conference  11/18/2020   
11/18/2020  ORD - Order  11/19/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
11/18/2020  ORD - Order  11/19/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
11/18/2020  ORD - Order  11/19/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
11/18/2020  ORD - Order  11/19/2020   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS 
11/14/2020  REL - Reply  11/17/2020   
NOTE: REPLY TO OBJECTION TO MOTION(S) FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF WITNESS(ES) 
11/13/2020  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  11/17/2020   
NOTE: Objection to Mothers Motion(s) for Telephonic Appearance of Witness(es) 
11/10/2020  STA - Statement  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Fathers Separate Pretrial Statement  
11/10/2020  STA - Statement  11/13/2020   
NOTE: Respondent/Mothers Separate Pre-Hearing Statement 
11/9/2020  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  11/12/2020   
NOTE: Affidavit of Financial Information  
11/9/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  11/12/2020   
NOTE: Fathers Amended list of witnesses and exhibits  
11/6/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  11/10/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Telephonic Appearance of Witness  
10/29/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  11/3/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Telephonic Appearance of Witness  
10/26/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  10/27/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Telephonic Appearance of Witness  
10/26/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  10/27/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Telephonic Appearance of Witness  
10/26/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  10/27/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Telephonic Appearance of Witness  
10/21/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  10/21/2020   
NOTE: Mothers List of Witnesses and Exhibits  
10/21/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  10/22/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS List of Witnesses and Exhibits  
10/14/2020  029 - ME: Status Conference  10/14/2020   
10/8/2020  ORD - Order  10/8/2020   
NOTE: ORDER APPOINTMENT OF A BEHAVIORAL HEALTH PROFESSIONAL 
9/16/2020  ORD - Order  9/18/2020   
NOTE: RESETTING STATUS CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 09/18/2020 
9/15/2020  MCO - Motion To Continue  9/17/2020   
NOTE: Unopposed Expedited motion to continue STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 18 2020 
9/9/2020  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/9/2020   
8/27/2020  REL - Reply  8/28/2020   
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE TO COUNTERMOTION FOR COMPREHENSIVE FAMILY EVALUATION 
8/25/2020  REL - Reply  8/27/2020   
NOTE: REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH EXPERT FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OF MOTHER AND RESPONSE TO MOTHER’S COUNTERMOTION FOR COMPREHENSIVE FAMILY EVALUATION 
8/12/2020  REL - Reply  8/13/2020   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion for Clarification 
8/11/2020  RES - Response  8/12/2020   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH EXPERT FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL EXAMINATION OF MOTHER AND COUNTERMOTION FOR COMPREHENSIVE FAMILY EVALUATION  
8/10/2020  RES - Response  8/12/2020   
NOTE: Response to Mother's Motion for Clarification  
8/7/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  8/7/2020   
8/6/2020  NOT - Notice  8/7/2020   
NOTE: A.R.F.L.P. 49 (J) DISCLOSURE NOTICE RE: EXPERT WITNESS 
8/4/2020  COT - Petition For Contempt - Other  8/4/2020   
NOTE: PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT AND CONTEMPT RE: DECREE/PD 89 REC 27892027 
7/31/2020  MOT - Motion  7/31/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Appointment of Behavioral Health Expert for Psychological Examination of Mother  
7/30/2020  019 - ME: Ruling  7/30/2020   
7/27/2020  MOT - Motion  7/28/2020   
NOTE: MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION 
7/22/2020  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  7/28/2020   
7/20/2020  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  7/20/2020   
7/17/2020  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  7/17/2020   
7/1/2020  REL - Reply  7/1/2020   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion for Immediate Return of Minor Children to Arizona and for Children to Remain in Arizona During Pendency of this Matter 
6/30/2020  REL - Reply  6/30/2020   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion to Set Aside Judgment/Order or n the alternative Motion to Modify Emergency Temporary Order 
6/30/2020  REL - Reply  7/1/2020   
NOTE: Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Petition to Modify Legal Decision Making, Parenting Time and Child Support 
6/26/2020  RES - Response  6/29/2020   
NOTE: Fathers Response to Mothers Motion to Dismiss Petitioner to Modify Legal Decision Making Parenting Time and CHild Support  
6/26/2020  RES - Response  6/29/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS Response to MOTHERS Motion to Set Aside Judgment/ORDER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY EMERGENCY TEMPORARY ORDERS 
6/26/2020  RES - Response  6/29/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS Response to MOTHERS Motion for Immediate Return of MINOR Children TO ARIZONA AND FOR CHILDREN TO REMAIN IN ARIZONA DURING PENDENCY OF THIS MATTER 
6/25/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/25/2020   
6/24/2020  STA - Statement  6/25/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Separate Pre-Hearing Statement 
6/24/2020  STA - Statement  6/25/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS SEPARATE Pretrial statement  
6/24/2020  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  6/25/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Filing PETITIONER’S AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION 
6/23/2020  RRR - Req Restrict Release Address  6/23/2020  Respondent 
NOTE: Request for Protected Address 
6/17/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  6/18/2020   
NOTE: Mothers List of Witnesses and Exhibits  
6/17/2020  LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence  6/18/2020   
NOTE: Fathers List of Witnesses and Exhibits  
6/11/2020  MOT - Motion  6/11/2020   
NOTE: Motion for Immediate Return of Minor Children to Arizona and for Children to Remain in Arizona During Pendency of this Matter 
6/11/2020  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  6/11/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Petition to Modify Legal Decision-Making Parenting Time and Child Support 
6/11/2020  MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment  6/11/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Set Aside Judgment/Order or in the alternative Motion to Modify Emergency Temporary Orders  
6/8/2020  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  6/9/2020   
NOTE: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CLIENT CONSENT 
5/26/2020  056 - ME: Hearing Set  5/26/2020   
5/20/2020  MOT - Motion  5/21/2020   
NOTE: motion to postpone deposition of GILBERT POLICE DEPARTMENT DETECTIVE R PILLAR # 3438 CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 5/21/20 
5/19/2020  MOT - Motion  5/19/2020   
NOTE: MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA  
5/15/2020  REL - Reply  5/18/2020   
NOTE: reply to fathers response to mothers motion to hold petitioner in contempt FOR HIS MISLEADING AND FALSE STATEMENT MADE TO THE COURT 
5/13/2020  NOT - Notice  5/13/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Deposition of Gilbert Police Department Detective R. Pillar #3438 
5/12/2020  STA - Statement  5/13/2020   
NOTE: Petitioners Resolution Statement 
5/11/2020  STA - Statement  5/12/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Resolution Management Statement  
5/1/2020  700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set  5/1/2020   
4/29/2020  ORD - Order  4/30/2020   
NOTE: STIPULATED / TERMINATING PETITIONERS SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE OBLIGATION TO RESPONDENT 
4/2/2020  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  4/2/2020   
3/23/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  3/23/2020   
3/20/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  3/23/2020   
NOTE: Amended Notice of AppeArance 
3/17/2020  RES - Response  3/19/2020   
NOTE: Fathers Response to Mothers Motion to Hold Petitioner in Contempt FOR HIS MISLEADING AND FALSE STATEMENT MADE TO THE COURT 
3/17/2020  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  3/19/2020   
NOTE: AMENDED 
3/16/2020  RES - Response  3/18/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS Response to Mothers Motion to Hold Petitioner in Contempt for his Misleading and False Statement made to the Court 
3/12/2020  STA - Statement  3/13/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Brief to the Court on Motion to Hold Petitioner in Contempt for Misleading and False Statements Made to the Court 
3/11/2020  AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06  3/12/2020   
3/2/2020  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  3/2/2020   
2/27/2020  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  2/28/2020   
NOTE: Update Information on MAILING Address and Name 
2/25/2020  COT - Petition For Contempt - Other  2/26/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Motion to Hold Petitioner in Contempt for His Misleading and False Statement Made to the Court 
2/20/2020  STA - Statement  2/24/2020   
NOTE: Petitioners Resolution Statement 
2/19/2020  RES - Response  2/21/2020   
NOTE: FATHERS Response to Mothers Petition to Modify Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time, and Child Support 
2/19/2020  STA - Statement  2/21/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Resolution Management Statement 
1/31/2020  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  2/5/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Re Acceptance of Service 
1/27/2020  SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access  1/28/2020   
1/27/2020  MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc  1/29/2020   
1/27/2020  CEI - Current Employer Information  1/28/2020   
1/27/2020  AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children  1/28/2020   
1/27/2020  PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support  1/28/2020   
1/14/2020  RES - Response  1/15/2020   
NOTE: Respondents Response to Petition to Stop/Terminate Husbands Spousal Maintenance Obligation to Respondent Pursuant to A.R.S. 25-504 
1/9/2020  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  1/13/2020   
NOTE: Acceptance of Service  
1/7/2020  ORA - Order To Appear  1/8/2020   
NOTE: FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
1/3/2020  MSM - Petition To Modify Spousal Support - Osc  1/6/2020   
NOTE: Petition to Stop/Terminate Petitiner/Husbands Spousal Maintenance Obligation to Respondent/Wife Pursuant to A.R.S. 25-504 PD 89 R# 27584079 
1/2/2020  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  1/3/2020   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
12/19/2019  RNM - Returned Mail  12/19/2019   
NOTE:  
12/17/2019  ORD - Order  12/18/2019   
NOTE: RE TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME 
12/16/2019  OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO  12/16/2019   
NOTE:  
12/16/2019  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  12/16/2019   
12/5/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  12/10/2019   
12/4/2019  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  12/9/2019   
12/2/2019  MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc  12/5/2019   
NOTE: FATHER’S PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION MAKING, PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT/ PAID $89.00 RECEIPT #27546180 
12/2/2019  ORD - Order  12/4/2019   
NOTE: FOR LEAVE TO SERVE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS 
11/22/2019  MOT - Motion  11/26/2019   
NOTE: RESPONDENT’S EXPEDITED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS 
11/15/2019  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  11/15/2019   
11/7/2019  ORA - Order To Appear  11/8/2019   
NOTE: RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
11/6/2019  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  11/7/2019   
10/25/2019  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  10/25/2019   
NOTE:  
10/22/2019  PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support  10/23/2019   
10/22/2019  OCS - Order For Child Support  10/28/2019   
10/22/2019  CDS - Consent Decree  10/28/2019   
NOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing 
10/22/2019  ORD - Order  10/23/2019   
NOTE: DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE 
10/22/2019  ORA - Order To Appear  10/23/2019   
NOTE: FOR RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 
10/18/2019  PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS  10/21/2019   
NOTE: Petitioner Emergency Motion for Temporary Orders Regarding Legal Decision Making And Parenting Time 
10/16/2019  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  10/17/2019   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance  
10/16/2019  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  10/17/2019  Respondent 
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid 
8/13/2019  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  8/15/2019   
NOTE: Parent Education Certificate 
8/4/2019  PEC - Parent Education Certificate  8/7/2019   
NOTE: Parent Education Certificate 
7/12/2019  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  7/16/2019  Respondent 
7/8/2019  COM - Complaint  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
7/8/2019  SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
7/8/2019  PIN - Preliminary Injunction  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
7/8/2019  SUM - Summons  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
7/8/2019  NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
7/8/2019  ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf  7/9/2019   
7/8/2019  AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children  7/9/2019  Petitioner 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
11/6/201911:00  Resolution Management Conference 
12/11/201915:30  Resolution Management Conference 
2/27/202015:30  Resolution Management Conference 
3/26/202014:00  Resolution Management Conference 
4/23/202016:00  Resolution Management Conference 
5/18/202011:00  Resolution Management Conference 
7/1/202016:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
9/18/20209:00  Status Conference 
10/8/202015:30  Status Conference 
11/17/202014:00  Status Conference 
11/18/20208:30  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
11/18/202014:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
11/19/20208:30  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
11/19/202014:00  Trial/Evidentiary Hearing 
5/24/202115:30  Status Conference 
6/9/202110:00  Status Conference