Family Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | FC2019-094817 | Judge: | Miller, Keith |
File Date: | 5/21/2019 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Family Court With Children |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Clifford Brendon Gibb | Petitioner | Male | Pro Per |
Melanie Racheal Gibb | Respondent | Female | Pro Per |
Party is a minor: name not published | Minor | Male | Pro Per |
Party is a minor: name not published | Minor | Male | Pro Per |
Party is a minor: name not published | Minor | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/7/2019 | CDS - Consent Decree | 8/16/2019 | |
NOTE: Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing | |||
8/7/2019 | PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support | 8/12/2019 | Petitioner |
8/6/2019 | CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid | 8/9/2019 | Respondent |
NOTE: Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid | |||
8/2/2019 | PEC - Parent Education Certificate | 8/6/2019 | |
NOTE: Parent Education Certificate | |||
7/18/2019 | PEC - Parent Education Certificate | 7/19/2019 | |
NOTE: Parent Education Certificate | |||
6/6/2019 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 6/11/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | COM - Complaint | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | PIN - Preliminary Injunction | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | SUM - Summons | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
5/21/2019 | ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf | 5/23/2019 | |
5/21/2019 | AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children | 5/23/2019 | Petitioner |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |