« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2019-094290
Judge:
McDowell, David
File Date:
4/22/2019
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Tyrone Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Camila Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/15/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
7/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2019
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
7/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING
Filing Date
7/9/2019
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/5/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
6/7/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/4/2019
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/6/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED
Filing Date
6/1/2019
Description
ERC - Early Resolution Management Conference
Docket Date
6/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/20/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/17/2019
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
5/20/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AGREEMENT
Filing Date
5/17/2019
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/22/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
5/6/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
4/23/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
7/11/2019
Time
8:15
Event
Early Resolution Conference