« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2018-051910
Judge:
Mata, Julie
File Date:
2/20/2018
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kirsten Leanne Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Christopher Lazenby
Party Name
Kyle Anthony Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2024
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/20/2024
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/29/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/3/2024
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMPLOYERS ANSWER TO ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
12/27/2023
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/28/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMPLOYERS ANSWER TO ORDER/NOTICE TO WITHHOLD INCOME FOR CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/27/2022
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/29/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/23/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/19/2019
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/19/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/18/2019
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/18/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2019
Description
SMS - Stipulation To Mod Child Supp
Docket Date
12/9/2019
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
POST-DECREE
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/20/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/18/2018
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2018
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Pretrial Statement of Petitioner
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/5/2018
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2018
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/2/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
11/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
10/9/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue Trial
Filing Date
10/1/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/2/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/20/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
9/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/28/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/30/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR RESUBMISSION OF AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/24/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/23/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/22/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
8/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
WAIVED
Filing Date
8/16/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
8/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
8/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
8/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2018
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FAMILY COURT PREHEARING
Filing Date
8/6/2018
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
8/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
8/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Exparte Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record with Clients Consent
Filing Date
8/2/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/2/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
8/1/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION FOR TEMP ORDERS
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO PARTIALLY SET ASIDE DEFULT DECREE OF DISSOLUTION
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
7/19/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AND PARENTING TIME/PARENTING SCHEDULE
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
7/20/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/18/2018
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
7/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/12/2018
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo/Appearance Fee Paid
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance/PAID $274 REC # 26684644
Filing Date
7/3/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Partially Set Aside Default Decree of Dissolution
Filing Date
6/27/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/22/2018
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
6/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/6/2018
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
6/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
6/7/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
6/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
6/4/2018
Description
NLR – Notice Of Limited Scope Representation
Docket Date
6/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/8/2018
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
5/11/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/6/2018
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate KIRSTEN MEREDITH
Filing Date
2/23/2018
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
3/1/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
AGAINST BOTH PETITIONER AND RESPONDENT
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/20/2018
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/23/2018
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/4/2018
Time
14:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
7/26/2018
Time
11:30
Event
Return Hearing
Date
8/14/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
8/14/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
11/26/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/18/2018
Time
10:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing