« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2018-000242
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
2/12/2018
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Niccole Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Adam Joseph Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2022
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
4/27/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT APPOINTED ADVISOR REPORT
Filing Date
4/16/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/28/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2018
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/27/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING LEGAL DECISION-MAKING PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
3/20/2018
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/21/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/8/2018
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/14/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
SMC - Stipulation To Modify Custody
Docket Date
3/2/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
FOR: JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING (JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY) WITH JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING (JOINT LEGAL CUSTODY) AGREEMENT
Filing Date
2/26/2018
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
2/27/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REGISTRATION OF CHILD CUSTODY DETERMINATIN
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO REGISTRATION FOREIGN CUSTODY/LEGAL DECISION MAKING/PARENTING TIME OR VISITATION ORDER IN ARIZONA
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO REGISTER FOREIGN CUSTODY ORDER UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY/JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT/CERTIFIED COPY FROM ORANGE COUNTY
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
DDI - Decree Of Dissolution
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Decree of Dissolution
Filing Date
2/12/2018
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/14/2018
Filing Party
Respondent
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file