« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2016-092233
Judge:
Miller, Keith
File Date:
4/1/2016
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Tyrone Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Camila Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2016
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REINSTATE DISMISSED CASE
Filing Date
10/10/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/12/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO REINSTATE DISMISSED CASE
Filing Date
8/10/2016
Description
OLS - Order Dismiss Lack Of Service
Docket Date
8/10/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2016
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/17/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2016
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
6/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/1/2016
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
4/4/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file