« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2016-001770
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
7/22/2016
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Dawn M Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
James Braatz
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/12/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/13/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/2/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/2/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
11/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Motion for Reconsideration
Filing Date
11/4/2016
Description
APM - Affidavit of Direct Payment
Docket Date
11/16/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/25/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2016
Description
MSM - Petition To Modify Spousal Support - Osc
Docket Date
10/11/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
10/3/2016
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/3/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT LEGAL DECISION-MAKING/CUSTODY
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
9/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2016
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
9/28/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/24/2016
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
8/24/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
8/17/2016
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
APPLICATION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT IN FAMILY COURT CASES
Filing Date
8/9/2016
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
8/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
7/27/2016
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
8/2/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/22/2016
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
7/25/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/26/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular