« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2015-094911
Judge:
Jackson, Charlene
File Date:
8/10/2015
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Katarzyna Stefania Florczak
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Brandon Curtis Atchley
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Phillip Robert Meredith
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Jennifer Moshier
Party Name
Elizabeth Jeanne Meredith
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jennifer Moshier
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/26/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/7/2025
Description
375 - Case on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/5/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/5/2025
Description
AMP - Amended Post Decree Petition/Motion/Request
Docket Date
3/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Amended Petition Establish In Loco Parentis Status for the Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time and to Relocate Minor Child
Filing Date
2/28/2025
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
2/28/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/20/2025
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/21/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proposed Resolution Statement for Intervenors
Filing Date
2/19/2025
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
2/19/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Alternative Service via Text message and social media account
Filing Date
2/18/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/18/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER RE: MOTION FOR
ALTERNATIVE SERVICE
Filing Date
2/13/2025
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/20/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/12/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/13/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENOR’S SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE VIA TEXT MESSAGE, MAILING OR BY SOCIAL MEDIA ACCOUNTS (ARFLP 41 (l) and (m))
Filing Date
2/10/2025
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/10/2025
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERVENORS’ SECOND
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR
TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT
NOTICE
Filing Date
2/7/2025
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/7/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Expedited Motion for Alternative Service via Text Message, Mailing or by Social Media Accounts (ARFLP 41 (I) and (m)
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO APPEAR Resolution Management Conference
Filing Date
1/24/2025
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/27/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT NOTICE ON IN LOCO PARENTIS PETITION
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
POT - Petition For Other Osc
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition to Intervene (ARFLP Rule 33) and to Establish In Loco Parentis Status for the Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time of a Minor (A.R.S. 25-409)/EFILE BILLING $389 + Paid $65.00 Receipt# 30111339
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Intervenors
Filing Date
1/21/2025
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
1/24/2025
Filing Party
NOTE:
Emergency Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice on In Loco Parentis Petition
Filing Date
5/14/2016
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
5/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL
Filing Date
4/29/2016
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
5/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2016
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/28/2016
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/19/2016
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER’S INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 49 ARIZONA RULES OF FAMILY LAW PROCEDURE
Filing Date
4/19/2016
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/20/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER'S PROPOSED RESOLUTION STATEMENT/RMC: APRIL 26, 2016 AT 3:30
Filing Date
3/23/2016
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2016
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
3/10/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO RESCHEDULE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
1/27/2016
Description
700 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set
Docket Date
1/27/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/27/2016
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/20/2016
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
12/7/2015
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/4/2015
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
11/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION: PARENT INFORMATION PROGRAM / KATARZYNA ATCHLEY ATTENDED
Filing Date
11/2/2015
Description
OXS - Order To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2015
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
10/30/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petitioners Motion To Extend Time For Service
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
10/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2015
Description
NLS - Notice Of Lack Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUIRING STRICT COMPLIANCE WITH THE ARIZONA RULES OF EVIDENCE
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND REQUEST FOR NOTICE
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/22/2016
Time
8:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
4/26/2016
Time
15:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
2/25/2025
Time
14:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference