« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2015-092503
Judge:
Jackson, Charlene
File Date:
3/18/2015
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Camila M Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Tyrone Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/21/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
MODIFYING CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
3/15/2017
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
3/20/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2017
Description
PRS - Praecipe Simp Mod Child Suppor
Docket Date
3/14/2017
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/15/2016
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/9/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/9/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
11/25/2015
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
12/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE NON COMPLIANCE TO HAND OVER PROPERTY ORDER/CONTEMPT
Filing Date
11/17/2015
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/17/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
11/2/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/3/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR NON-COMPLIANCE TO HAND OVER PROPERTY TAKEN OVER & HOLD IN CONTEMPT
Filing Date
10/27/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2015
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/26/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/20/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING ALL FUTURE COURT HEARINGS/TRIALS/STATUS CONFERENCES IN THIS MATTER
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
OF DISSIPARTION OF MARITAL ASSET PLEAD/MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO DISCONTINUE MEDICAL COVERAGE
Filing Date
10/1/2015
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
10/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/7/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO EXPEDITE FINAL HEARING
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO RECEIVE COPY OF RESPONDENTS AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/30/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
7/20/2015
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
7/16/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/20/2015
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO EXPEDITE FINAL HEARING
Filing Date
7/16/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
7/17/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO PREVENT DISSIPATION OF MARITAL ASSETS
Filing Date
7/1/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/6/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO SUBMIT AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
6/19/2015
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
6/19/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
6/4/2015
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
6/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Credit Memo
Filing Date
5/14/2015
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
5/6/2015
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
5/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2015
Description
703 - ME: Appoint of a Parenting Conference Provider
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF COLLATERAL RECORDS FOR PARENTING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
ANP - Acknowledgment & Notice of Parenting Conference
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2015
Description
ANP - Acknowledgment & Notice of Parenting Conference
Docket Date
5/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/30/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
5/4/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/27/2015
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
5/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
4/9/2015
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS WITH NOTICE
Filing Date
4/7/2015
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/10/2015
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/7/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
4/8/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY/FOR PARENTING TIME/FOR CHILD SUPPORT/FOR SPOUSAL MAINTENANCE/FOR PROPERTY AND/OR DEBT/ATTORNEY FEES
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/6/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/26/2015
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/2/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/18/2015
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/30/2015
Time
13:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
8/5/2015
Time
8:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular
Date
10/2/2015
Time
8:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference
Date
1/14/2016
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing