« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2015-000563
Judge:
Drake, Jim
File Date:
2/2/2015
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Erin Richardson
Party Name
Patricia Ann Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael Ortiz
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/6/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/10/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2019
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/13/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/28/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/15/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/3/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
3/12/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/9/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/16/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/1/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
1/26/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2015
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2015
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/1/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
4/28/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
4/22/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/14/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/10/2015
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
4/15/2015
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
3/5/2015
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2015
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
2/9/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2015
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2015
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2015
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
2/4/2015
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/13/2015
Time
9:30
Event
Establishment Hearing