« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2014-006133
Judge:
Jackson, Charlene
File Date:
10/2/2014
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Amy E Harshbarger
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Shawn D Hammack
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Dianne Sullivan
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2023
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/3/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2023
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
11/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
9/24/2023
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
9/27/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Parent Education Certificate
Filing Date
9/20/2023
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/13/2023
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
9/20/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING, PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/6/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/6/2023
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
9/11/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
8/28/2023
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
8/28/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2023
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/16/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRE-TRIAL STATEMENT OF RESPONDENT
Filing Date
8/11/2023
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/15/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR RECONCILLIATION OF PEACE AND FRIENDSHIP
Filing Date
8/9/2023
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/11/2023
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/12/2023
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
5/12/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2023
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/21/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2023
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/25/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2023
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/16/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2023
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
3/15/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
376 – Case Continued on Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/2/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2023
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
3/7/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
2/9/2023
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/13/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Filing Date
1/12/2023
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/24/2023
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
12/28/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/28/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT'S RESPONSE TO PETITIONER’S MOTION
Filing Date
12/16/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/21/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR UBI JUS IBI REMEDIUM
Filing Date
11/28/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/2/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO COMPEL DISCLOSURE AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Filing Date
11/1/2022
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/5/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
10/12/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/12/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2022
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
10/10/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2022
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/5/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR UBI JUS IBI REMEDIUM
Filing Date
9/21/2022
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
9/21/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/9/2022
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/14/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/21/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
7/26/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
7/12/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
7/2/2022
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/28/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/19/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
4/7/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
2/8/2022
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2022
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/9/2022
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING REQUESTED
Filing Date
1/31/2022
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/4/2022
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Continue on Inactive Calendar
Filing Date
11/24/2021
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
11/24/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2021
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/22/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/19/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/19/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
TEMPORARY
Filing Date
11/16/2021
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
11/10/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
11/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/13/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/13/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2021
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/1/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2021
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/8/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CANCELLATION/VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL IN ADDRESS CONFIDENTIALITY PROGRAM
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/2/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
REVISED Motion for Emergency Order WITHOUT NOTICE RE DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME PURSUANT TO RULE 48
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / AND ORDER TO APPEAR FOR HEARING
Filing Date
8/24/2021
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
9/1/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE TEMPORARY ORDERS WITH NOTICE / VIRTUAL HEARING
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Modification of Legal Decision Making/Parenting Time and Child Support/PD 89 REC 28407374
Filing Date
8/23/2021
Description
TOW – Motion for Temporary Orders Without Notice
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Emergency Order WITHOUT NOTICE RE DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME PURSUANT TO RULE 48
Filing Date
8/22/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/25/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/7/2021
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as attorney of record
Filing Date
3/7/2021
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal as attorney of record
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/23/2018
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
1/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Attorneys Fees and Costs
Filing Date
1/18/2018
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
1/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2018
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
1/19/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2017
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/16/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL/
Filing Date
11/15/2017
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/17/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
FATHER'S SEPARATE PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
11/9/2017
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
11/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
11/2/2017
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/2/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2017
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
10/3/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/8/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/9/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Firm Address
Filing Date
7/21/2017
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
7/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2017
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
7/24/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT-APPOINTED ADVISOR REPORT
Filing Date
7/17/2017
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
7/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2017
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
6/28/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2017
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
3/16/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2017
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition to Modify Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Filing Date
2/17/2017
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
2/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/27/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2017
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/10/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
2/9/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/7/2017
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
2/9/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/6/2017
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
2/1/2017
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/2/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
1/24/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/30/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2017
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
1/20/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
1/17/2017
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
1/23/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
POST-DECREE/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION MAKING/CUSTODY/PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
1/4/2017
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
1/5/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record
Filing Date
11/7/2016
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
11/16/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/4/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2016
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME, AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
9/20/2016
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
9/23/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/16/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition for Make-Up Parenting Time Due to False Allegations and Denial of Parenting Time
Filing Date
9/15/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/16/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME AND MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
9/14/2016
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/14/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Withdrawal of Petitioners Petition to Modify Child Legal Decision-Making and Parenting Time and Motion for Post-Decree Temporary Orders for Legal Decision-Making without Notice
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/9/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR POST-DECREE TEMPORARY ORDERS FOR LEGAL DECISION-MAKING AND PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
9/8/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/7/2016
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
9/8/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
POST-DECREE/FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
9/2/2016
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/7/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/26/2016
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/26/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
8/26/2016
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/29/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION MAKING PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT PETITION FOR MAKE UP TIME DUE TO FALSE ALLEGATIONS AND DENIAL OF PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
8/22/2016
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/25/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/16/2016
Description
RAC - Request for Change Of Address/Name
Docket Date
8/18/2016
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACP PARTICIPATION
Filing Date
8/15/2016
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2016
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
7/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
7/15/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
7/15/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/14/2016
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
7/20/2016
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
POST-DECREE/WITHOUT NOTICE FOR MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION MAKING/CUSTODY/PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
1/28/2016
Description
NHC – Notice of High Conflict Resolution Class
Docket Date
1/28/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2016
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
1/21/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
NHC – Notice of High Conflict Resolution Class
Docket Date
1/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/2016
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
1/12/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/7/2016
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/7/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/29/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/29/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/28/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
1/5/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/24/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/29/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 84/FOR CLARIFICATION OF NEW YEARS HOLIDAY PARENTING TIME AND ORDER
Filing Date
12/18/2015
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Filing Date
12/18/2015
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
12/18/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2015
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/16/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
12/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONERS SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
12/2/2015
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/7/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENTS PRE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/14/2015
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
9/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2015
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2015
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/26/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2015
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
8/24/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/20/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2015
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONERS PROPOSED RESOLUTION STATEMENT
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
8/18/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED BY PETITIONER ON JULY 17 2015 AND REPLY TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
8/12/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED BY PETITIONER ON JULY 17 2015
Filing Date
8/11/2015
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/13/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2015
Description
NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right
Docket Date
8/11/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/12/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/5/2015
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
8/6/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO REQUEST TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED BY PETITIONER ON JULY 17 2015 MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE SAME
Filing Date
8/3/2015
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF CONFLICT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/31/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2015
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
8/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2015
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/23/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING
Filing Date
7/21/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/24/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND ORDER
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/21/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF STRICT COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
7/22/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/23/2015
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/31/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/17/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/20/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL AND ORDER
Filing Date
3/3/2015
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
3/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/2/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/5/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
2/24/2015
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/2/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGREEMENT FOR LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PARENTING TIME PARTIAL AGREEMENT
Filing Date
1/7/2015
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
1/14/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/30/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
12/30/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
12/17/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/17/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRE HEARING/OF RESPONDENT FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS HEARING
Filing Date
12/12/2014
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
12/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
12/12/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
12/15/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Mother's Pre Hearing Statement for the Temporary Orders Hearing on December 19th at 11:00 a.m
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
12/3/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Certificate of Completion of Parent Information Program
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF COLLATERAL RECORDS FOR PARENTING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
12/2/2014
Description
703 - ME: Appoint of a Parenting Conference Provider
Docket Date
12/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2014
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
12/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
ANP - Acknowledgment & Notice of Parenting Conference
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
ANP - Acknowledgment & Notice of Parenting Conference
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
11/24/2014
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
11/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Temporary Orders; Response to Father's Motion for Temporary Orders
Filing Date
11/21/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proposed Resolution Statement of: Mother
Filing Date
11/21/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice Requiring Strict Compliance with Arizona Rules of Evidence Pursuant to ARFLP Rule 2B
Filing Date
11/20/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED PATERNITY RESOLUTION/OF RESPONDENT
Filing Date
11/19/2014
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
11/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/13/2014
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
11/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
11/3/2014
Description
059 - ME: Case Transfer To Se
Docket Date
11/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
No Objection to Motion to Transfer Case to Southeast Judicial District
Filing Date
10/27/2014
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2014
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2014
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/2014
Description
MTT - Motion To Transfer
Docket Date
10/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SOUTHEAST JUDICIAL DISTRICT
Filing Date
10/9/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/22/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
10/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
10/3/2014
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/24/2014
Time
14:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
12/19/2014
Time
11:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
3/2/2015
Time
10:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
9/1/2015
Time
14:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/8/2015
Time
15:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/17/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Parental Conflict Resolution Class
Date
3/14/2016
Time
8:15
Event
Parental Conflict Resolution Class
Date
9/2/2016
Time
11:30
Event
Return
Date
10/4/2016
Time
13:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
2/8/2017
Time
15:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
7/20/2017
Time
13:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/20/2017
Time
15:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/16/2017
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/28/2021
Time
15:30
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
10/7/2021
Time
10:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
11/17/2021
Time
16:00
Event
Temporary Orders
Date
10/5/2022
Time
15:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
5/10/2023
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
8/17/2023
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing