Family Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: FC2013-094133 Judge: Ponce, Adele
File Date: 7/24/2013 Location: Southeast
Case Type: Family Court With Children  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
WitnessDept Of Economic Security (DES)   Petitioner    Rebecca Rennick 
Carmenetta Rena  Brown   Petitioner  Female  Pro Per 
Jeremy Eugene  Bridges   Respondent  Male  Pro Per 
Party is a minor: name not published   Minor  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
8/17/2020  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  8/17/2020   
7/16/2020  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  7/17/2020   
6/17/2020  RNM - Returned Mail  6/17/2020   
NOTE:  
6/15/2020  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  6/15/2020   
6/12/2020  RNM - Returned Mail  6/12/2020   
NOTE:  
5/22/2020  256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing  5/22/2020   
5/6/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/7/2020   
NOTE: Affidavit of Service 
4/30/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/1/2020   
NOTE: Affidavit of Service 
4/21/2020  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  4/21/2020   
4/2/2020  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  4/2/2020   
3/27/2020  OAT - Order To Appear By Telephone  3/30/2020   
3/24/2020  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/26/2020   
NOTE: Certificate of Service 
3/16/2020  MAT - Motion to Appear Telephonically  3/17/2020   
NOTE: Motion to Appear by Phone 
3/6/2020  ORA - Order To Appear  3/6/2020   
NOTE: Order To Appear Title IV-D 
3/2/2020  MCS - Petition To Modify Child Support - Osc  3/4/2020   
NOTE: Petition to Modify Support PD 89 R# 27683873 
2/24/2020  RNM - Returned Mail  2/24/2020   
NOTE:  
2/7/2020  056 - ME: Hearing Set  2/7/2020   
2/6/2020  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  2/7/2020  Respondent 
1/17/2020  266 - ME: Quash/Ret C/Sup Arrest Warr  1/17/2020   
1/8/2020  CSW - Child Support Arrest Warrant  1/10/2020   
9/12/2019  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  9/13/2019   
5/8/2019  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  5/10/2019   
5/3/2019  RNM - Returned Mail  5/3/2019   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
4/25/2019  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  4/25/2019   
NOTE:  
4/22/2019  265 - ME: Child/Support Arrest Warrant Issued  4/22/2019   
4/18/2019  CEI - Current Employer Information  4/25/2019   
4/18/2019  JOR - Judgment And Order  4/26/2019   
NOTE: Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
4/18/2019  IWA – Issuance of Warrant  4/19/2019   
NOTE: Issued 2019-04-18 
4/2/2019  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  4/2/2019   
3/14/2019  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/14/2019   
NOTE: Certificate of Service 
2/19/2019  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  2/20/2019   
2/4/2019  ORA - Order To Appear  2/5/2019   
1/24/2019  CCS - Petition For Contempt - Child Support  1/24/2019   
NOTE: Petition to Enforce Support/DES CO CHG RECEIPT # 27007001 
10/29/2018  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  10/31/2018   
9/25/2018  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  9/26/2018   
7/9/2018  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  7/10/2018   
11/9/2016  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  11/10/2016   
3/4/2016  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  3/7/2016   
7/20/2015  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  7/22/2015   
7/16/2015  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  7/21/2015   
9/9/2014  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  9/11/2014   
2/11/2014  AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006  2/12/2014   
1/17/2014  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  1/17/2014   
12/26/2013  IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access  12/26/2013   
NOTE:  
12/20/2013  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  12/26/2013   
12/16/2013  256 - ME: Iv-D Hearing  12/16/2013   
12/5/2013  CEI - Current Employer Information  12/18/2013   
12/5/2013  JOR - Judgment And Order  12/24/2013   
NOTE: Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
11/1/2013  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  11/1/2013   
10/28/2013  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  10/31/2013   
10/28/2013  NOF - Notice Of Filing  10/30/2013   
NOTE: GENERAL TESTIMONY 
9/17/2013  056 - ME: Hearing Set  9/17/2013   
9/16/2013  OGT - Order for Genetic Tests  9/17/2013   
9/3/2013  MOT - Motion  9/6/2013   
NOTE: FOR GENETIC TESTING 
7/30/2013  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/7/2013   
7/24/2013  COM - Complaint  7/26/2013   
7/24/2013  SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access  7/26/2013   
7/24/2013  SUM - Summons  7/26/2013   
7/24/2013  ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf  7/26/2013   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/31/20138:15  Establishment Hearing 
12/5/201314:30  Establishment Hearing 
3/21/201913:30  IV-D Enforcement of Support 
4/18/20198:15  IV-D Enforcement of Support 
12/31/201923:00  Initial Appearance 
1/10/202014:00  Return 
2/6/202010:00  IV-D Review Hearing 
4/2/20208:30  IV-D Review Hearing 
4/23/202010:00  IV-D Modification of Support - Standard 
5/21/202013:15  IV-D Review Hearing 
6/11/20209:00  IV-D Modification of Support - Standard 
8/13/20209:30  IV-D Modification of Support - Standard