« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2013-053162
Judge:
Woo, Cassie
File Date:
6/21/2013
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Nicholas Catsoules
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
John Zarzynski
Party Name
Brandice Nicole Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
N/A
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2020
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
7/23/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/17/2020
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/22/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE AGREEMENT TO MODIFY PREVIOUS COURT ORDER RE PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
7/8/2020
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
7/9/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER/ RE AGREEMENT TO MODIFY PREVIOUS COURT ORDER/ RE PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
10/21/2019
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/21/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
10/15/2019
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/16/2019
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/16/2019
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
9/20/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Filing Date
8/9/2019
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/12/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING AGREEMENT TO MODIFY PREVIOUS COURT ORDER RE PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
8/6/2019
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
8/8/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Filing Order re: Agreement to Modify Previous Court Order for Parenting Time and Child Support
Filing Date
8/1/2019
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/1/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2019
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
7/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement and Motion to Vacate Evidentiary Hearing
Filing Date
5/9/2019
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2019
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/1/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLUTION STATEMENT OF MOTHER
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/29/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Financial Information
Filing Date
4/26/2019
Description
COT - Petition For Contempt - Other
Docket Date
4/30/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Petition to Modify Legal Decision-Making, Parenting Time and Child Support and Counter-Petition for Contempt/PAID $89 RECEIPT #27184585
Filing Date
4/25/2019
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/26/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Proposed Resolution Statement of Husband
Filing Date
4/24/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/25/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCEPTANCE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
4/22/2019
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/22/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance and Waiver of Service of Process BY ATTORNEY
Filing Date
4/15/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/16/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
4/9/2019
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
4/10/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE RESOLUTION MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE RE POST DECREE
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
POST-DECREE
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
4/11/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/8/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/4/2019
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
4/9/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/29/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/29/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
8/16/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
7/23/2013
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
7/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
PPL – PARENTING PLAN
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
JOINT LEGAL DECISION MAKING AUTHORITY
Filing Date
6/21/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/24/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/6/2019
Time
10:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
8/8/2019
Time
11:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing