« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2012-008050
Judge:
Parker, Amanda
File Date:
10/18/2012
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Shawn Walters
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Martin Keil
Party Name
Pamela Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Party is a minor: name not published
Relationship
Minor
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2019
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
1/9/2019
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
12/31/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2018
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
1/2/2019
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2018
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/29/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2018
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/19/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Acceptance of Service
Filing Date
5/22/2018
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Accelerated Ruling
Filing Date
5/22/2018
Description
MXS - Motion To Extend Time For Service
Docket Date
5/24/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Extend Time for Service
Filing Date
4/17/2018
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2018
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/6/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2018
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
3/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2018
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/26/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2017
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/31/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2017
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
9/21/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2017
Description
SMS - Stipulation To Mod Child Supp
Docket Date
3/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIES' AGREEMENT TO MODIFY PRIMARY RESIDENTIAL PARENT TO FATHER AND ELIMINATE DRUG TESTING AND SUPERVISED PARENTING TIME PURSUANT TO RULE 69 A R F L P
Filing Date
2/26/2014
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
2/28/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER/FATHER'S DRUG TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
2/14/2014
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2014
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/19/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/11/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/26/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ RE: PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
1/29/2014
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF RESPONDENT
Filing Date
1/17/2014
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
REGARDING PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
1/17/2014
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/13/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
1/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
1/8/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
1/6/2014
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
1/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/31/2013
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2013
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/24/2013
Description
903 - ME: Judgment/Decree
Docket Date
7/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2013
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
6/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/6/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/7/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING HEARING
Filing Date
2/14/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF CONFLICT AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE
Filing Date
2/13/2013
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
2/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2013
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
1/25/2013
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/28/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
1/23/2013
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/23/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 01/14/2013
Filing Date
1/9/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING TEMPORARY SOLE LEGAL DECISION MAKING AND PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD TO RESPONDENT AND ORDER TO APPEAR RETURN HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
1/8/2013
Description
PTO - PETITION/MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS
Docket Date
1/10/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/8/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/10/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
PROPOSED PATERNITY RESOLUTION
Filing Date
1/4/2013
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
1/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAMELA MEREDITH
Filing Date
12/13/2012
Description
240 - ME: Order/Protection Quashed
Docket Date
12/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2012
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/14/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
12/5/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/6/2012
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
12/4/2012
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
12/3/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
12/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISMISSAL OF ORDER OF PROTECTION
Filing Date
12/3/2012
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/3/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2012
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF PROTECTION
Filing Date
11/28/2012
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
11/29/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
OPH - Order For Hearing On Order Of Protection
Docket Date
11/27/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2012
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
11/28/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/26/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/20/12
Filing Date
11/20/2012
Description
TRM - Transmittal
Docket Date
11/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MAYER JUSTICE COURT/PETITION FOR ORDER OF PROTECTION/ORDER OF PROTECTION/REQUEST FOR HEARING/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE:SERVED 10/24/12/HEARING ORDER/NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE IN MARICOPA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/TRANSFER ORDER
Filing Date
10/30/2012
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CUSTODY AND ACCESS
Filing Date
10/26/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EMERGENCY CUSTODY/ACCESS HEARING
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/18/2012
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
10/22/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/28/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Return Hearing
Date
1/15/2013
Time
13:30
Event
Return Hearing
Date
5/6/2013
Time
15:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/23/2013
Time
10:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
2/11/2014
Time
13:00
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
2/11/2014
Time
14:15
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/13/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Status Conference