« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2012-001253
Judge:
Zabor, Melissa
File Date:
1/13/2012
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
(1)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Attorney
Janet Evans
Party Name
Jamie Lynn Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Orlando Pierre Joyner
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2012
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF REGISTRATION
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGISTRATION/CERTIFIED COPY FROM MICHIGAN
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATION OF RECORDS/ATTESTATION OF EXEMPLIFIED COPIES/CERTIIFED COPY FROM MICHIGAN
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNIFORM CHILD SUPPORT/CERTIFIED COPY FROM MICHIGAN
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
DFS - Default Decree
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file