« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2011-090554
Judge:
Wingard, William
File Date:
3/1/2011
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Richard Wayne Roy
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Angel Francine Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Jennifer Mihalovich
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/13/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/3/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
5/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
5/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
3/19/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/19/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
ASM - State's Affidavit for Modification of CS Simplified Procedure
Docket Date
3/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
PRS - Praecipe Simp Mod Child Suppor
Docket Date
3/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
3/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/12/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2011
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/25/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/20/2011
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
6/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2011
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
6/21/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
6/20/2011
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
6/21/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
6/20/2011
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
6/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
6/20/2011
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
6/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
ERC - Early Resolution Management Conference
Docket Date
4/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/6/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2011
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
4/4/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
3/3/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/20/2011
Time
10:30
Event
Early Resolution Conference