« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2011-050135
Judge:
Mata, Julie
File Date:
1/11/2011
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
 
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
James Warner Meredith
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Robert Gehrke
Party Name
Loni Ann Bushrow
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(3)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Amanda Ruiz
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/29/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/30/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/11/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/29/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/3/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2022
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
6/23/2022
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/31/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/18/2021
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
8/18/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/9/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/11/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2021
Description
OSO = Order stopping order of assignment IWO
Docket Date
7/26/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
7/23/2021
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/23/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2021
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
7/27/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2021
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/21/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO AGREEMENT TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT ORDER-NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
7/7/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/6/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/9/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/17/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2021
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/5/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
CERTIFICATE OF PROCESS
Filing Date
4/22/2021
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/26/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2021
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
4/21/2021
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
SMS - Stipulation To Mod Child Supp
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/21/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2020
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
12/22/2020
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
7/24/2020
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/24/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2020
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/13/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/24/2018
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
9/25/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/19/2018
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
4/20/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
3/12/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
2/5/2018
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
2/5/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
12/26/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2017
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/22/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
11/30/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/14/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/13/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2016
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/11/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/26/2015
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
5/27/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2014
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/12/2014
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
8/20/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/7/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
8/11/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/2/2014
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
7/8/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
6/25/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
6/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2014
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
6/18/2014
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
7/2/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH CLIENT CONSENT
Filing Date
6/2/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
5/29/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/23/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/20/2014
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
5/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/14/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/12/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
5/6/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/24/2014
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
4/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/8/2014
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
4/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED ORDER FOR INSTALLATION OF CONTINUOUS ALCOHOL MONITORING ANKLE BRACELET
Filing Date
4/2/2014
Description
CRC – Court Report Confidential
Docket Date
4/3/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2014
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/31/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2014
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
3/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2014
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/27/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
3/24/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
4/7/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2014
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
4/23/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2014
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/24/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITIONER PRETRIAL
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
3/3/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
3/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/21/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/25/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/20/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/18/2014
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
2/18/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/7/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/11/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/4/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
2/3/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
2/4/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
1/28/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/30/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
1/27/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/29/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
1/27/2014
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
2/5/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/21/2014
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Withdraw as Petitioner's Attorney of Record
Filing Date
1/16/2014
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/14/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/10/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
1/10/2014
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
1/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TESTING
Filing Date
12/30/2013
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
12/30/2013
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/31/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
DRUG TEST RESULTS FOR PETITIONER
Filing Date
12/24/2013
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
12/24/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2013
Description
230 – ME: Appointment of Child Representative
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2013
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONER'S PETITION TO PREVENT RELOCATION OF MINOR CHILD OUT OF STATE AND TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION-MAKING, PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
10/4/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
10/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL INFORMATION
Filing Date
10/4/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
10/8/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION
Filing Date
9/30/2013
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
10/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2013
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
10/2/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLTUION
Filing Date
9/24/2013
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/25/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE
Filing Date
9/24/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/26/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITIONER'S PETITION TO PREVENT RELOCATION OF MINOR CHILD OUT OF STATE AND TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION MAKING PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/24/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
10/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/13/2013
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2013
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
9/16/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE PETITION TO ENFORCE PARENTING TIME
Filing Date
9/10/2013
Description
701 - ME: Resolution Management Conference Set/Trial Setting
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2013
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/11/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
MEDIATION INAPPROPRIATE
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONERS PETITION TO PREVEND RELOCATION OF MINOR CHILD OUT OF STATE AND TO MODIFY LEGAL DECISION-MAKING/PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/5/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/6/2013
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
9/4/2013
Description
CME - Credit Memo
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT PAID $100 MADIATION FEE
Filing Date
8/30/2013
Description
CVS - Petition For Contempt - Visitation
Docket Date
9/9/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2013
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
9/10/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
8/28/2013
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/30/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONDENTS CROSS-PETITION TO PERMIT RELOCATION WITH MINOR CHILD MODIFY PARENTING TIME AND CHILD SUPPORT AND REQUEST MEDIATION
Filing Date
8/15/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
8/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/8/2013
Description
POT - Petition For Other Osc
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/6/2013
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
8/8/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR MEDIATION
Filing Date
8/2/2013
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/14/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR POST-DECREE MEDIATION
Filing Date
7/29/2013
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
8/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/26/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/1/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/7/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2013
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
7/22/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/19/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPLY WITH STEPS REQUIRED BY ARIZONA LAW TO OBTAIN MODIFICATION OF LEGAL DECISION MAKING AUTHORITY
Filing Date
7/16/2013
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/29/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 07/12/13
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
7/12/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
AFC - Affidavit Regarding Minor Children
Docket Date
7/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
NFM – Notice Of Filing Petition For Modification Of Child Custody.
Docket Date
7/15/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/2013
Description
MCH - Petition To Modify Child Custody - Osc
Docket Date
7/16/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
7/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
6/3/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/23/2013
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/4/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2012
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/12/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/11/2012
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/19/2011
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANALYSIS
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
4/19/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
JCP - Joint Custody Plan
Docket Date
4/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
4/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION /
Filing Date
4/11/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/13/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESOLUTION /
Filing Date
3/10/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/15/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
RE:MOTION FOR BLOOD TESTING PURSUANT TO ARS 25-807
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/10/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
TO MOTION FOR BLOOD TESTING
Filing Date
2/28/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/4/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
FOR BLOOD TESTING PURSUANT TO ARS §25-807C
Filing Date
2/12/2011
Description
ERC - Early Resolution Management Conference
Docket Date
2/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2011
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
2/2/2011
Filing Party
Respondent
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/11/2011
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/13/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/15/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Early Resolution Conference
Date
9/4/2013
Time
8:00
Event
Mediation
Date
10/7/2013
Time
9:30
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
12/17/2013
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/15/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/24/2014
Time
13:30
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/28/2014
Time
10:00
Event
Modification Of Child Support
Date
6/18/2014
Time
14:00
Event
Modification Of Child Support
Date
7/28/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/5/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/22/2014
Time
9:30
Event
Review Hearing