« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2010-094609
Judge:
Cushner, Quintin
File Date:
11/8/2010
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Raul Hernandez Vieyra
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Tamera Shanker
Party Name
Elizabeth Alvarez Vieyra
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Tamera Shanker
Party Name
Jose Arturo Gonzalez Carranza
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
(4)Dept Of Economic Security (DES)
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Attorney
Kristian Morales
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2023
Description
AOA – Administrative order of assignment IWO restricted if filed after 1/1/2006
Docket Date
10/26/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/9/2021
Description
IVE - Intervenor Fee
Docket Date
3/10/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Intervenor Fee
Filing Date
3/5/2021
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/9/2021
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of the States Entry of Appearance
Filing Date
8/21/2018
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/21/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
8/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRATE SOLUTIONS COMPANY / VENDOE QUICK REPORT
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
8/20/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAYMENT LIST
Filing Date
8/17/2018
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
8/23/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/18/2018
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/18/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/11/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
4/17/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED/
Filing Date
3/13/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
3/13/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2018
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
2/28/2018
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2018
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
1/25/2018
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/19/2018
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
1/23/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
12/11/2017
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/14/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/8/2017
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/8/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/5/2017
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2017
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/4/2017
Description
ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/4/2017
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2017
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/5/2017
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
CLERICAL CORRECTION
Filing Date
4/13/2017
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
4/17/2017
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2016
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/18/2016
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2014
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/30/2014
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
7/1/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2014
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/4/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
1/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
12/19/2012
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
12/21/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/17/2012
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
12/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARREARS CALCULATION
Filing Date
12/17/2012
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
12/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/25/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 10/18/2012
Filing Date
10/23/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
11/7/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2012
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2012
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
9/20/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
COA - Order To Appear For Conference
Docket Date
6/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
ESE - Expedited Request To Enforce Support
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2012
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
6/19/2012
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/24/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
5/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CORRECT NUNC PRO TUNC COURT'S FINDINGS DATED 04/22/2011
Filing Date
5/18/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CORRECT CLERICAL ERROR
Filing Date
5/2/2011
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
5/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2011
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/26/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/22/2011
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
4/26/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/15/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLOSING / OF RAUL AND ELIZABETH VIEYRA - THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS
Filing Date
4/14/2011
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
4/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRIAL / RE CLOSING ARGUMENT
Filing Date
4/5/2011
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2011
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONFIDENTIAL COURT/
Filing Date
3/31/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/31/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 03/28/11
Filing Date
3/28/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS PRE-TRIAL / PURSUANT TO RULE 6.8 LOCAL RULES OF MARICOPA COUNTY
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT PRETRIAL /
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SUBMISSION OF EXHIBITS
Filing Date
3/24/2011
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS / TO BE PRESENTED AT TRIAL
Filing Date
3/23/2011
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
3/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENT ATTENDED
Filing Date
3/23/2011
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
VERIFICATION OF ATTENDANCE FOR RESPONDENT
Filing Date
3/23/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS/RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/17/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENTS MOTION TO COMPEL & REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS/RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS OBJECTION & RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/9/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONDENTS / TO COMPEL AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS/RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY PETITIONERS OBJECTION AND RESPONSE TO RESPONDENTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/1/2011
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
3/2/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/3/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED/FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE REPLY
Filing Date
12/30/2010
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THIRD-PARTY PETITIONERS/ TO RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD PURSUANT TO ARS §25-415
Filing Date
12/23/2010
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/27/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO REPLY TO RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO PETITION IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD
Filing Date
12/16/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/16/2010
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PETITION IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD
Filing Date
12/15/2010
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
12/15/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2010
Description
230 - ME: Couns Appointed For Child
Docket Date
12/15/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/05/2010
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILDR
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/7/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO RESPPNDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STRIKE RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO CONTINUE PURSUANT TO RULE 11
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF WITHDRAWAL NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
12/3/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
12/8/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/26/10
Filing Date
11/29/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 11/26/10
Filing Date
11/24/2010
Description
PTO - Petition Temp Orders
Docket Date
12/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
EMERGENCY / IN LOCO PARENTIS CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
11/24/2010
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING EMERGENCY TEMPORARY CUSTODY OF A MINOR CHILD
Filing Date
11/24/2010
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS WITHOUT NOTICE
Filing Date
11/22/2010
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/22/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/6/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Emergency Hearing
Date
3/24/2011
Time
14:00
Event
Telephonic
Date
4/1/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
9/17/2012
Time
14:15
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
9/17/2012
Time
15:30
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
12/17/2012
Time
8:00
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
12/17/2012
Time
9:15
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/19/2018
Time
8:30
Event
Enforcement Conference
Date
1/19/2018
Time
9:45
Event
Enforcement Evidentiary Hearing
Date
3/23/2018
Time
14:00
Event
Review Hearing
Date
4/6/2018
Time
13:30
Event
Review Hearing
Date
4/13/2018
Time
14:15
Event
Review Hearing
Date
8/17/2018
Time
14:30
Event
Review Hearing