« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2010-094607
Judge:
Valenzuela, Michael
File Date:
11/8/2010
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jacquelyn Laursen
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mario Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2023
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
2/6/2023
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
10/14/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/12/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
9/12/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
9/10/2013
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
9/13/2013
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
IWO – Income Withholding Order - Restricted Access
Docket Date
8/21/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
8/21/2013
Description
CEI - Current Employer Information
Docket Date
8/27/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2011
Description
UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
3/11/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
PPR - Praecipe For Order Protection
Docket Date
2/16/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
POP - Petition/Order Of Protection
Docket Date
2/16/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
2/15/2011
Description
OPR - Order Of Protection
Docket Date
2/16/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/14/2011
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
2/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
2/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment and Order: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
OCS - Order For Child Support
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
PWC - Parent Worksheet/Child Support
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2011
Description
SCP - Sole Custody Plan
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
TO MOTHER
Filing Date
1/13/2011
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
1/18/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
1/5/2011
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
1/7/2011
Filing Party
Petitioner
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
12/20/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED 12/09/2010
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2010
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
12/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
11/8/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
11/9/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/8/2011
Time
8:45
Event
Decree on Demand - Regular