« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2010-070347
Judge:
Garbarino, David
File Date:
4/28/2010
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Shawn Patrick Walters
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Pamela Jean Meredith
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
1/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2010
Description
OLP - Order Dismiss Lack Prosecution
Docket Date
11/16/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2010
Description
NIC - Notice Of Placement Of The Case On Inactive Calendar And Of Intent To Dismiss Your Court Case
Docket Date
8/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2010
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/4/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
ASA - Affidavit in Support of Application for Deferral or Waiver of Service Process Costs
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Filing Date
4/28/2010
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
Petitioner
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file