« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
FC2009-091656
Judge:
Wahlin, Lisa S.
File Date:
5/1/2009
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Family Court With Children
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Vicki F Whiting
Relationship
Petitioner
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
GARY L WHITING
Relationship
Respondent
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2010
Description
NWA - Notice Of Withdrawal Of Attorney
Docket Date
5/28/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2010
Description
OOA - Order Of Assignment / Restricted If Filed After 1/1/2006
Docket Date
4/30/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/21/2010
Description
CDS - Consent Decree
Docket Date
4/23/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy of Decree Mailed/Provided to parties on date of filing
Filing Date
4/21/2010
Description
PEC - Parent Education Certificate
Docket Date
4/26/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITIONER ATTENDED
Filing Date
4/21/2010
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
4/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/22/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2009
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
9/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO POSTPONE TRIAL
Filing Date
9/2/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 9/24/09
Filing Date
8/31/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO VACATE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/24/09
Filing Date
6/2/2009
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
6/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/2009
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED RESOLUTION
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2009
Description
ORA - Order To Appear
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PETITIONERS COUNSELS AVAILABILITY
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
AFI - Affidavit of Financial Information, Restricted after 1/1/06
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO APPEAR RE TEMPORARY ORDERS
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
ONA - Ord & Notice Attend Parent Inf
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
NCH - Notice To Convert Health Ins
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
PIN - Preliminary Injunction
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2009
Description
SDS - Sensitive Data Sheet - Restricted Access
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/27/2009
Time
10:00
Event
Resolution Management Conference
Date
9/24/2009
Time
13:30
Event
Family Settlement Conference
Date
11/24/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing
Date
4/27/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Trial/Evidentiary Hearing